Global Patent Index - EP 0946955 B1

EP 0946955 B1 2000-06-14 - ELECTRIC UNIVERSAL SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRIC UNIVERSAL SWITCHING DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHES UNIVERSALSCHALTWERK

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE COMMUTATION UNIVERSEL ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 0946955 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 97954410 A

Priority

  • DE 19654252 A
  • DE 19750610 A
  • EP 9707073 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9828761A1] The invention relates to an electric universal switching device. The universal switching device has an upper base block (1) and a lower base block (2) as well as a mobile selection element (3). In the universal switching device, all switching variants are lodged and connected in four switch and contact chambers (7). By means of the mobile selection element (3), the switching variants which are to be realized are selected by movement between end positions to a defined position, fixed switching variants are assigned to defined positions on the travel. During its travel, the selection element (3) opens and closes the entry and/or exit apertures of the base block that are assigned to the corresponding switching variants.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/0018 (2013.01); H01H 11/0031 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9828761 A1 19980702; AT 193959 T 20000615; CZ 298046 B6 20070606; CZ 9901573 A3 19991013; EP 0946955 A1 19991006; EP 0946955 B1 20000614; ES 2149019 T3 20001016; GR 3034409 T3 20001229; HR P970697 A2 20010228; HR P970697 B1 20010831; HU 0000545 A2 20000628; HU 0000545 A3 20000728; NO 317120 B1 20040816; NO 993097 A 19990817; NO 993097 D0 19990622; PL 187356 B1 20040630; PL 334056 A1 20000131; PT 946955 E 20000929

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20161229

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091216

2009-06-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080702

2009-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071217

2009-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20071217

2009-02-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20081218

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-10-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-10-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071231

2008-09-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080616

2008-07-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071216

2008-07-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-06-27 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080616

2006-12-21 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-21 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20061221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-20 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20061220

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-19 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20061219

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-15 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20061215

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-12-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051216

2003-09-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-08-04 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-29 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030701

2003-06-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *N & L ELEKTROTECHNIK G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20021231

2003-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-12-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-17 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021217

2002-12-16 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-01-11 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020111

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-01-03 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020103

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20011227

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-12-21 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20011221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2149019 T3

2000-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000627

2000-09-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-08-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59701900 20000720

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCHMAUDER & PARTNER AG PATENTANWALTSBUERO

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193959 T 20000615

1999-12-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991108

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990623

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IT LI LU NL PT SE