Global Patent Index - EP 0947012 A4

EP 0947012 A4 2000-02-09 - LITHIUM MANGANESE OXY-FLUORIDES FOR LI-ION RECHARGEABLE BATTERY ELECTRODES

Title (en)

LITHIUM MANGANESE OXY-FLUORIDES FOR LI-ION RECHARGEABLE BATTERY ELECTRODES

Title (de)

LITHIUM MANGAN OXY-FLUORIDE FÜR ELEKTRODEN EINER AUFLADBAREN LI-IONEN-BATTERIE

Title (fr)

OXY-FLUORURES DE LITHIUM MANGANESE POUR ELECTRODES DE BATTERIES AUX IONS DE LITHIUM RECHARGEABLES

Publication

EP 0947012 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 97910695 A

Priority

  • US 9715588 W
  • US 70654696 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2263662A1] The cycling stability and capacity of li-ion rechargeable batteries are improved by the use of lithium manganese oxy-fluoride electrode component intercalation materials having the general formula Li1+xMyMn2-x-yO4-zFz, where M is a metal, e.g., Co, Cr, or Fe, and x0.4, y0.3 and 0.05z1.0.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01M 4/50; C01G 45/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C01G 45/00 (2006.01); C01G 49/00 (2006.01); C01G 51/00 (2006.01); H01M 4/36 (2006.01); H01M 4/50 (2010.01); H01M 4/505 (2010.01); H01M 4/58 (2010.01); H01M 4/02 (2006.01); H01M 4/1315 (2010.01); H01M 10/0525 (2010.01); H01M 10/36 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01M 4/505 (2013.01); C01G 45/1242 (2013.01); C01G 49/0018 (2013.01); C01G 49/0072 (2013.01); C01G 49/009 (2013.01); C01G 51/54 (2013.01); H01M 4/582 (2013.01); C01P 2002/52 (2013.01); C01P 2002/54 (2013.01); C01P 2002/72 (2013.01); C01P 2002/77 (2013.01); C01P 2006/40 (2013.01); H01M 4/1315 (2013.01); H01M 10/0525 (2013.01); H01M 2004/028 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 626 (E - 1636) 29 November 1994 (1994-11-29)
  • See also references of WO 9810476A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

AU 4799697 A 19980306; AU 711516 B2 19991014; CA 2263662 A1 19980312; EP 0947012 A1 19991006; EP 0947012 A4 20000209; JP 2000514773 A 20001107

INPADOC legal status


2003-06-11 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021206

2000-02-16 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7H 01M 4/50 A, 7C 01G 45/12 B, 7H 01M 4/36 B, 7C 01G 45/00 B

2000-02-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 19991229

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE

1999-12-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TELCORDIA TECHNOLOGIES, INC.

1999-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: AMATUCCI, GLENN, G.

1999-12-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TARASCON, JEAN-MARIE

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990209

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT NL SE