Global Patent Index - EP 0947151 A3

EP 0947151 A3 2002-09-04 - Shelf unit

Title (en)

Shelf unit

Title (de)

Regal

Title (fr)

Etagères

Publication

EP 0947151 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104255 A

Priority

DE 19814516 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947151A2] The shelving structure has suitable feet (2) to support vertical columns (1) to hold the suspended arms (3) which carry the shelves (4). The structure has stabilizers (5,6) to give the shelving rigidity along its length (L). The arms (3) are profiled from a number of bent wall sections, and have plug fittings to hold the stabilizers (5,6). Locks block inadvertent vertical movements of the arms (3).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 96/06; A47B 47/02; A47B 57/42

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65G 1/02 (2006.01); A47B 47/02 (2006.01); A47B 57/42 (2006.01); A47B 96/06 (2006.01); A47B 96/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 47/022 (2013.01); A47B 47/028 (2013.01); A47B 57/42 (2013.01); A47B 96/06 (2013.01); A47B 96/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947151 A2 19991006; EP 0947151 A3 20020904; EP 0947151 B1 20040121; AT 258022 T 20040215; AT 342679 T 20061115; CZ 297567 B6 20070207; CZ 9901068 A3 20000913; DE 19814516 A1 19991007; DE 59913938 D1 20061130; EP 1205128 A2 20020515; EP 1205128 A3 20020828; EP 1205128 B1 20061018; PL 195464 B1 20070928; PL 332231 A1 19991011

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2011-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100303

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-10-13 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101001

2010-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *META-REGALBAU G.M.B.H. & CO. K.G.

- Effective date: 20100331

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090312

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-05-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090317

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-01-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041022

2004-10-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-06-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040513

2004-05-02 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040502

2004-04-21 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040421

2004-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040303

2004-02-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908335 P 20040226

2004-02-25 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2004-01-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-21 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040121

2003-06-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2003-06-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI LU NL

2003-05-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030304

- Countries: AL

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030304

- Countries: LT

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030304

- Countries: LV

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030304

- Countries: MK

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030304

- Countries: RO

2003-05-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20030304

- Countries: SI

2003-05-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: META-REGALBAU GMBH & CO. KG

2003-02-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030102

2003-01-15 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20021114

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-09-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI