Global Patent Index - EP 0947225 B1

EP 0947225 B1 2001-05-30 - Safety ski binding

Title (en)

Safety ski binding

Title (de)

Sicherheitsskibindung

Title (fr)

Fixation de sécurité de ski

Publication

EP 0947225 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105752 A

Priority

EP 98105752 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947225A1] The safety ski boot binding has a leading pad (13) for the toe cap and a heel holder (2). The leading pad (13) swings against a spring (15) action, as an angled lever for the sole holder. The heel holder (2) has a base plate (4), a base body with a sole holder (7) to swing to the side, and a control cam (9) to give a release action against a spring in a diagonal direction. The control cam (9) swings in relation to the base plate (4). For a horizontal swing of the base body with a closed sole holder (7), the lock is broken by pressure from the ball of the foot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/084

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/084 (2006.01); A63C 9/085 (2006.01); A63C 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0846 (2013.01); A63C 9/0845 (2013.01); A63C 9/005 (2013.01); A63C 9/0842 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947225 A1 19991006; EP 0947225 B1 20010530; AT 201606 T 20010615; DE 59800787 D1 20010705

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-03-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2002-05-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-11-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-08-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2001-07-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTBUERO PAUL ROSENICH AG

2001-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59800787 20010705

2001-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-05-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2001-05-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 201606 T 20010615

2000-10-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000830

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-04-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000301

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI