Global patent index - EP 0947256 A3

EP 0947256 A3 2001-01-24 - Method and apparatus for straightening metal profiled elements and the like

Title (en)

Method and apparatus for straightening metal profiled elements and the like

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Richten von Metallprofilen und dergleichen

Title (fr)

Procédé et appareil de dressage de profilés métalliques et similaires

Publication

EP 0947256 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105027 A

Priority

IT BO980207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947256A2] An apparatus for straightening metal profiled elements, particularly iron rods, comprising pairs of wheels (3,4) arranged in series, with parallel axes, on opposite sides with respect to a plane along which one or more side-by-side rods (2) to be straightened are fed. At an output region, the apparatus has a first split wheel (20) and a second split wheel (21), which are arranged in series and are adapted to cooperate with respective contrarotating wheels (3,4). Each one of the split wheels is constituted by at least a pair of wheels (22,23) arranged side by side which are adapted to be engaged respectively by the side-by-side rods (2) and are provided with an independent adjustment of the position of the axis in a direction which is perpendicular to the feed plane of the rods. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 3/05; B21F 1/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/02 (2006.01); B21F 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 3/02 (2013.01); B21F 1/02 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947256 A2 19991006; EP 0947256 A3 20010124; EP 0947256 B1 20030910; AT 249292 T 20030915; DE 69911094 D1 20031016; DE 69911094 T2 20040708; DK 0947256 T3 20040105; IT 1299943 B1 20000404; IT BO980207 A1 19990930; IT BO980207 A3 19990930; IT BO980207 D0 19980330

INPADOC legal status

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080322

2009-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080322

2008-11-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070530

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-16 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-09-01 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040614

2004-01-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2003-12-21 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031221

2003-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69911094

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-16

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-09-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES IT

2001-10-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE DK ES IT

2001-09-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010705

2001-01-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE DK ES IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI