Global patent index - EP 0947257 A3

EP 0947257 A3 2000-10-25 - Device for the manufacture of reinforcement cages for rectangularsection concrete pipes

Title (en)

Device for the manufacture of reinforcement cages for rectangularsection concrete pipes

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Herstellung von Bewehrungskörben für Rechteckrohre aus Beton

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la fabrication de cages d'armatures pour tuyaux en béton à section rectangulaire

Publication

EP 0947257 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105706 A

Priority

DE 19814091 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947257A2] To form basket structures (3,4) of reinforcement wire rods (5), they are aligned parallel to the concrete pipe axis and are assembled on a frame (9). The frame has a fixed perforated frame (13) in the longitudinal direction, and a sliding holding frame (18). Straight or angled lateral rod sections or kinked bars are welded to the longitudinal wire rods as required, using a mobile fitting unit traveling at right angles to the longitudinal wire sections, to place them according to the wire thickness and intervals. The frame (9) is on a turntable (10), for rotation round its vertical axis, between two welding units for the fittings. The fittings are aligned during welding. The finished reinforcement basket structures are taken by a crane (19-25) and fitted into each other.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21F 27/20; B21F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21F 27/12 (2006.01); E04C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/0618 (2013.01); B21F 27/125 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947257 A2 19991006; EP 0947257 A3 20001025; CA 2266840 A1 19990930; DE 19814091 A1 19991007; US 6148873 A 20001121

INPADOC legal status

2003-10-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030423

2003-01-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20021209

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE DK ES IT

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010405

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-10-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7B 21F 27/20 A, 7B 21F 27/12 B

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI