Global Patent Index - EP 0947292 B1

EP 0947292 B1 2002-11-20 - Flap grinding stick

Title (en)

Flap grinding stick

Title (de)

Lamellen-Schleifstift

Title (fr)

Tige de meulage à lamelles

Publication

EP 0947292 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99102564 A

Priority

DE 29806049 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947292A2] The grinding rod has a central axis (1) and grinding layers (1) which are flexible and planar. The layers define a cylindrical shape radially of the axis. The middle axis (2) area of adjacent layers are pressed into contact. There are two end faces (4,5) of the cylinder, with a recess (11) formed on the inner face of the cylinder to receive a rib on the outer surface of the synthetic wood core (7). A drive shaft (6) is mounted concentrically with the drive axis and is partially anchored in the core to extend from one end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24D 13/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24D 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK FR IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29806049 U1 19980618; AT 228044 T 20021215; DK 0947292 T3 20030303; EP 0947292 A2 19991006; EP 0947292 A3 20020327; EP 0947292 B1 20021120

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050211

2004-12-03 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-10-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041029

2004-09-27 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-09-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040901

2004-08-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: AUGUST *RUGGEBERG G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-03-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040301

2004-02-28 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040228

2004-02-11 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040211

2003-11-12 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030821

2003-08-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Document: IE 0947292E

2003-04-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030425

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-04-11 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-02-21 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030221

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-20 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20030220

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030218

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-02-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030217

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-10 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903441 20030102

2002-12-30 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2002-12-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE DE DK FR IT NL

2002-11-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK FR IT NL

2002-11-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 228044 T 20021215

2002-11-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BERMEOSOLO VICINAY, MAITE

2002-06-12 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20020409

2002-03-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-03-27 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI