Global Patent Index - EP 0947297 B1

EP 0947297 B1 2003-06-11 - Scissors halve for hand scissors

Title (en)

Scissors halve for hand scissors

Title (de)

Scherenhälfte für eine Handschere

Title (fr)

Moitié de ciseaux pour ciseaux à main

Publication

EP 0947297 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99106028 A

Priority

DE 29805836 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947297A1] The half-section has a grip part (22,24) with a grip eye (30,32) and an insert (26,28) of soft plastic, which is molded non-removably and without gap into the grip eye. The grip part is fastened to the blade part (18,20) and is of a different plastic to that of the insert. The insert has an integral outward projecting finger support (42).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B26B 13/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B26B 13/12 (2013.01); Y10T 16/516 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Ablichtung einer Büroschere "Magma Rostfrei 48321" die seit 1997 im Schreibtisch des 1.Prüfers ist

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805836 U1 19990318; EP 0947297 A1 19991006; EP 0947297 B1 20030611; EP 0947297 B2 20080220; ES 2200430 T3 20040301; ES 2200430 T5 20080701; US 2002170181 A1 20021121; US 6739057 B2 20040525

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-05-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180322

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-26 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-08-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170331

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-10-17 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2008-08-01 [NLR3] NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE

2008-08-01 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

2008-07-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2008-06-18 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20080401256

2008-05-27 [REG SE RPEO] EP PATENT HAS BEEN REPUBLISHED IN MODIFIED FORM AFTER OPPOSITION AT EPO

2008-04-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20080220

2008-02-20 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20080220

2008-02-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

2005-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KAI R & D CENTER CO. LTD.

2005-04-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20040124

2005-04-20 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: KAI R & D CENTER CO. LTD.

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: WILLIAM PRYM GMBH & CO. KG

2004-07-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KAI R & D CENTER CO. LTD.

2004-06-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WILLIAM PRYM GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-05-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KAI R & D CENTER CO. LTD.

- Effective date: 20040310

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-04-28 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: WILLIAM PRYM GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20040309

2004-03-24 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: FIRMA WERNER DORSCH GMBH

- Effective date: 20040124

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200430 T3

2003-12-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20031022

2003-09-24 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030403177

2003-09-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905907 P 20030717

2003-06-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2003-06-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-11-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011009

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

2000-05-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000303

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB GR IT NL SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI