Global Patent Index - EP 0947299 B1

EP 0947299 B1 2001-03-28 - Process and apparatus for making concrete products with exposed aggregates

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for making concrete products with exposed aggregates

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Betongegenständen mit sichtbaren Zuschlagstoffen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour fabriquer des éléments en béton avec aggegats visibles en surface

Publication

EP 0947299 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 97310031 A

Priority

  • EP 97310031 A
  • CA 2224454 A
  • GB 9726273 A
  • US 98889397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2332170A] A cementitious product has a surface finish simulating the surface and aspect of natural stone and is manufactured from a cementitious mix, preferably a mix comprising fine particles such as sand and cement and and coarse particles such as aggregate, by a pressing process in which the surface finish is produced during the pressing. In particular, the mix is pressed in a mould by a resilient body, e.g. of plastics, rubber or elastomer, such that the action of that body causes fine particles to be cleaned from coarse particles which are thus left exposed on the surface of the product.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28B 3/02; B28B 7/00; B28B 23/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 3/02 (2006.01); B28B 7/00 (2006.01); B28B 19/00 (2006.01); B28B 23/00 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01); B30B 15/06 (2006.01); B44C 5/04 (2006.01); B44F 9/04 (2006.01); C04B 41/53 (2006.01); C04B 41/72 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/024 (2013.01); B28B 3/024 (2013.01); B28B 19/0007 (2013.01); B28B 23/0075 (2013.01); B28B 23/0081 (2013.01); B30B 15/065 (2013.01); B44C 5/04 (2013.01); B44F 9/04 (2013.01); C04B 28/02 (2013.01); C04B 41/5323 (2013.01); C04B 41/72 (2013.01); C04B 2111/542 (2013.01); Y10S 264/43 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C04B 28/02 + C04B 20/0076 + C04B 40/0071

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2332170 A9; GB 2332170 A 19990616; GB 2332170 B 20000315; GB 9726273 D0 19980211; AT 200051 T 20010415; CA 2224454 A1 19990611; DE 69710782 D1 20020404; DE 69710782 T2 20030605; DE 69710782 T3 20080508; DK 0947299 T3 20010716; EP 0947299 A1 19991006; EP 0947299 B1 20010328; EP 0947299 B2 20061004; ES 2155965 T3 20010601; GR 3035736 T3 20010731; PT 947299 E 20010731; US 6159401 A 20001212

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-10-25 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69710782

- Effective date: 20120703

2012-01-27 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111223

2012-01-21 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69710782

- Representative's name: MEHLER ACHLER PATENTANWAELTE, DE

2011-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110207

- Year of fee payment: 14

2011-02-04 [REG FR EERR] CORRECTION AND/OR MODIFICATIONS ON EUROPEAN PATENTS WHICH HAVE EFFECT OR NO EFFECT IN FRANCE

- Free text: CORRECTION DE BOPI 07/21 - 3.2.

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071211

2009-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2008-07-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2008-07-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061212

2008-06-30 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070525

2008-04-30 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070105

2007-09-19 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2007-06-25 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-06-11 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070611

2007-05-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2007-04-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2007-02-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-01-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070115

2007-01-04 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070104

2006-12-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-12-11 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061211

2006-12-01 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-10-31 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: MAINTIEN DU BREVET DONT L'ETENDUE A ETE MODIFIEE

2006-10-04 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20061004

2006-10-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2006-06-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-29 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20060629

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-09 [PGFP MC] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Payment date: 20060609

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-02 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20060602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-02 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20060602

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-06-01 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20060601

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060531

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-09-30 [REG PT NF4A] RESTITUTIO IN INTEGRUM

- Effective date: 20050804

2005-05-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20050527

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-05-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: SCHWENK LOESCH BETONTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69710782 20020404

2002-02-27 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: SCHWENK LOESCH BETONTECHNIK GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20011220

2001-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20010427

2001-07-16 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-15 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-06-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL S.A. * NOVAPAT INTERNATIONAL

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155965 T3

2001-04-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2001-04-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO GLP S.R.L.

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200051 T 20010415

2000-08-30 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT

2000-07-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2000-02-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981030

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980903

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI