Global Patent Index - EP 0947327 A3

EP 0947327 A3 2001-03-14 - Ink-jet print head, driving method thereof and ink-jet printer using the same

Title (en)

Ink-jet print head, driving method thereof and ink-jet printer using the same

Title (de)

Tintenstrahldruckkopf, Antriebsverfahren dafür und Tintenstrahldrucker mit einem solchen

Title (fr)

Tête d'impression à jet d'encre, procédé de commande et imprimante à jet d'encre utilisant une telle tête

Publication

EP 0947327 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99106686 A

Priority

JP 8996998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947327A2] In an ink-jet print head, a plurality of sets of pressure chambers (6a, b, c) and supply paths (7a, b, c) are provided to be connected to one another in series between a nozzle (5) and an ink pool (8). Piezoelectric transducers (1a, b, c) are arranged to be opposite to the respective pressure chambers. A driving circuit therefor sequentially applies voltage waveforms to the piezoelectric transducers starting from a piezoelectric transducer provided in the first pressure chamber connected to the ink pool to piezoelectric transducers of the nozzle-side adjacent pressure chambers. At this moment, the piezoelectric transducers provided in the nozzle-side pressure chambers are applied with voltage waveforms delayed in phase by 1/2 of natural periods of pressure waves in the pressure chambers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/14; B41J 2/045

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/04573 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/04588 (2013.01); B41J 2/14233 (2013.01); B41J 2002/14338 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947327 A2 19991006; EP 0947327 A3 20010314; AU 2354899 A 19991014; AU 739877 B2 20011025; CA 2267921 A1 19991002

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20020218

2001-12-05 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-10-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010820

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010202

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI