Global Patent Index - EP 0947329 A3

EP 0947329 A3 2000-01-26 - Ink supply container for an ink jet printhead

Title (en)

Ink supply container for an ink jet printhead

Title (de)

Tintenzufuhrbehälter für einen Tintenstrahldruckkopf

Title (fr)

Réservoir d'alimentation pour une tête d'impression à jet d'encre

Publication

EP 0947329 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302527 A

Priority

US 5541798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947329A2] An ink container for an ink printer is disclosed of the type wherein a foam member (48) is seated within a compartment (62) of the ink container in which ink is drawn by capillary action through an ink outlet port (18) in the container. The compartment (62) also has an air vent from which contact with ink is prevented either by mounting a pair of ribs beneath the air vent (32) to create an air space adjacent the vent (32) or by shaping a portion of a foam member which would otherwise contact the vent. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 2/175

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/175 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 2/17556 (2013.01); B41J 2/17513 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947329 A2 19991006; EP 0947329 A3 20000126; JP H11320908 A 19991124

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-11 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20020723

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000726

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI