Global Patent Index - EP 0947343 A3

EP 0947343 A3 2000-02-02 - Printer, particularly wire matrix printer

Title (en)

Printer, particularly wire matrix printer

Title (de)

Drucker, insbes. Nadel-Matrixdrucker

Title (fr)

Imprimante, en particulier imprimante à matrice d'aiguilles

Publication

EP 0947343 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98124395 A

Priority

DE 19813899 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947343A2] The printer has a print head holder (1) movable by a drive on a guide (8) parallel to a print medium supporting surface (6) carrying a print medium (5). The distance between the print head tip and the print medium supporting surface i.e. the print gap, is adjusted taking into account the thickness of the recording medium by a control drive controlled by a sensor. The sensor consists of a sensing finger (10) associated with the holder and an electrical transducer (14) actuated by the finger, which is mounted to detect positional changes, preferably the play, between the guide and holder. The transducer outputs a control signal when the head contacts the recording medium surface and thereby causes the holder to be raised. Independent claims are also included for a method of setting the print gap, and a method of setting the impact force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41J 25/308

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/308 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 25/3082 (2013.01); B41J 25/308 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813899 A1 19990930; EP 0947343 A2 19991006; EP 0947343 A3 20000202; EP 0947343 B1 20020313

INPADOC legal status


2013-11-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081222

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081222

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090701

2009-10-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090831

2009-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081222

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080122

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080124

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080125

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-03-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021216

2002-07-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020521

2002-04-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803330 20020418

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010530

2000-10-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000311

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI