Global Patent Index - EP 0947420 B1

EP 0947420 B1 2004-12-22 - Anchor and anchoring system which do not damage the seafloor

Title (en)

Anchor and anchoring system which do not damage the seafloor

Title (de)

Den Seeboden nicht beschädigender Anker und entsprechendes Verankerungssystem

Title (fr)

Ancre et système d'ancrage non destructifs pour fond marin

Publication

EP 0947420 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99400840 A

Priority

FR 9804146 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947420A1] The anchor consists of a metal spiral (10) made from heat treated steel or steel alloyed with silicium or vanadium which is screwed into the plant layer (40). The length of the spiral can be from one to several meters, its diameter of several dozen centimeters, and its pitch from a dozen to several dozen centimeters. A length of mooring line attached to the anchor is selected so that it lies at an angle of 30 - 60 degrees to the sea bed. Where necessary, a number of anchors can be inserted in a row and connected by a bar.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B63B 21/26; E02D 5/80

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/26 (2006.01); E02D 5/80 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63B 21/26 (2013.01); E02D 5/801 (2013.01); B63B 2021/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CY ES FR GR IT MC

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947420 A1 19991006; EP 0947420 B1 20041222; ES 2237054 T3 20050716; FR 2776982 A1 19991008; FR 2776982 B1 20000602

INPADOC legal status


2018-02-16 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170427

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-14 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2012-02-29 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111102

2012-01-17 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Document: GR 20050400946

- Effective date: 20111102

2011-07-08 [REG FR FC] FAVOURABLE DECISION OF INPI DIRECTOR GENERAL ON AN APPLICATION FOR RESTAURATION.

2011-05-13 [REG FR RN] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 12

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080406

2009-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080407

2009-06-26 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20080407

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070619

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20070416

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-12-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050923

2005-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2237054 T3

2005-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2005-04-20 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20050400946

2005-04-06 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050406

2004-12-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CY ES FR GR IT MC

2004-12-22 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021007

2000-07-20 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CY ES FR GR IT MC

2000-06-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000310

2000-05-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000310

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CY ES FR GR IT MC

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI