Global Patent Index - EP 0947462 A3

EP 0947462 A3 2000-04-12 - Conveying apparatus for bottle processing installation

Title (en)

Conveying apparatus for bottle processing installation

Title (de)

Vortisch an Gefässbehandlungsmaschinen

Title (fr)

Table de manipulation pour installation d'embouteillage

Publication

EP 0947462 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104366 A

Priority

DE 19814625 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947462A2] Individual feeder and discharge stars and processing units have drive mechanisms which are covered by a support plate. Several processing machines are fitted together into blocks. The rotational axle (13) of a rinser (11) is positioned on a first line (12) which is spaced apart from a second line (14) on which the rotary axles of the feeder and discharge stars (15,16) of the rinser and filler machine (17,18) are positioned. The axles (20) of the discharge star (21) of the filler machine are positioned on a further line (19) at an angle to the second line. The axles of a further capping machine (23) and the axle of a discharge star (25) of the crown-capper (22) and of the further capping machine (24) are positioned on a line (23) parallel with the third line (19).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67C 7/00; B67C 3/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/22 (2006.01); B67C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67C 3/22 (2013.01); B67C 7/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947462 A2 19991006; EP 0947462 A3 20000412; EP 0947462 B1 20020605; DE 19814625 A1 19991007; ES 2177159 T3 20021201; US 6276113 B1 20010821

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2012-03-31 [BECN] BE: CHANGE OF HOLDER'S NAME

- Owner name: KHS G.M.B.H.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BECN

- Effective date: 20120314

2012-01-30 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER GRANTED

- Owner name: KHS GMBH.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20120118

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111121

2011-12-23 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Owner name: KHS GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

- Effective date: 20111122

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2177159

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901591

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010219

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: BE DE ES FR GB IT

2000-07-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000510

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-12 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: CONVEYING APPARATUS FOR BOTTLE PROCESSING INSTALLATION

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI