Global Patent Index - EP 0947614 A3

EP 0947614 A3 2000-11-02 - Spinning machine with a drawing frame comprising a suction roller

Title (en)

Spinning machine with a drawing frame comprising a suction roller

Title (de)

Spinnmaschine mit einem eine Saugwalze aufweisenden Streckwerk

Title (fr)

Métier de filature avec un dispositif d'étirage pourvu d'un cylindre d'aspiration

Publication

EP 0947614 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106081 A

Priority

DE 19815050 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947614A2] The suction roller (12) is located above the sliver (9) and works with a lower roller (11) that has the normal diameter for the fiber being spun. The lower roller (11) has a metallic surface and the suction roller has an elastic coating (5) or vice versa. Optionally the transfer roller (10) can have an apron to assist sliver transfer from the last drafting roller to the suction roller.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/02; D01H 1/08; D01H 5/72; D01H 7/18; D02G 3/28; D02G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/66 (2006.01); D01H 1/02 (2006.01); D01H 1/08 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/74 (2006.01); D02G 3/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/08 (2013.01); D01H 1/025 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D02G 3/367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947614 A2 19991006; EP 0947614 A3 20001102; EP 0947614 B1 20040506; DE 19815050 A1 19991014; DE 19815050 B4 20050922; JP H11315429 A 19991116; US 6131383 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080326

2009-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-01-02 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20070615

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-04-04 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20070404

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2005-05-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050506

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-04-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050208

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909369 P 20040609

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030305

2001-09-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010731

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI