Global Patent Index - EP 0947615 A3

EP 0947615 A3 2000-11-15 - Method and spinning machine for producing a fictitious yarn

Title (en)

Method and spinning machine for producing a fictitious yarn

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Scheinzwirnes und Spinnmaschine hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé et métier de filature pour la production d'un fil fictif

Publication

EP 0947615 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106399 A

Priority

DE 19815053 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947615A2] Two slivers (9,9') pass separately side by side through a drafting system (1) fitted with a condensing arrangement (11) and are then twisted together into a pseudo-doubled yarn (50) and wound up (37). An Independent claim is also included for a spinning machine with a drafting system (1) producing two drawn slivers (10,10') at the delivery roller pair (4). The slivers are condensed separately on a condenser roller (12) with two rows of suction holes and are then twisted together and wound up, e.g. on a ring spindle (37).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/02; D01H 1/08; D01H 5/72; D01H 7/18; D02G 3/28; D02G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/02 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/74 (2006.01); D01H 7/02 (2006.01); D01H 7/90 (2006.01); D01H 7/92 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D01H 1/025 (2013.01); D01H 1/08 (2013.01); D02G 3/367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947615 A2 19991006; EP 0947615 A3 20001115; EP 0947615 B1 20040506; DE 19815053 A1 19991014; DE 19815053 B4 20060105; JP H11315425 A 19991116; US 6131382 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160327

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090326

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-08-16 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20060317

2005-04-27 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-04-06 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20050204

2005-03-30 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: MASCHINENFABRIK RIETER AG

- Effective date: 20050204

2004-06-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909370 P 20040609

2004-05-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-05-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2004-03-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2002-09-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020809

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI