Global Patent Index - EP 0947616 A3

EP 0947616 A3 2000-11-15 - Spinning machine with a drawing frame comprising a suction rotor

Title (en)

Spinning machine with a drawing frame comprising a suction rotor

Title (de)

Spinnmaschine mit einem einen Saugrotor aufweisenden Streckwerk

Title (fr)

Métier de filature avec un dispositif d'étirage pourvu d'un rotor d'aspiration

Publication

EP 0947616 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106402 A

Priority

DE 19815051 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947616A2] The axis of the suction rotor (11) is arranged so that the plane of the perforations on the rotor is tangential to the delivery rollers (4) of the drafting system in the plane of the nip. The suction rotor is fitted with a nip roller (24) at the end of the condensing zone. The thickness (H) of the rotor is kept as small as possible and the edges are chamfered (13).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 1/02; D01H 1/08; D01H 5/72; D01H 7/18; D02G 3/28; D02G 3/36

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 5/28 (2006.01); D01H 1/02 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/66 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/74 (2006.01); D01H 7/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/025 (2013.01); D01H 1/08 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D02G 3/367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947616 A2 19991006; EP 0947616 A3 20001115; DE 19815051 A1 19991014; JP H11315427 A 19991116; US 6032451 A 20000307

INPADOC legal status


2003-04-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20021001

2001-10-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010831

2001-08-01 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2000-11-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI