Global Patent Index - EP 0947618 A3

EP 0947618 A3 2000-10-25 - Method for producing a yarn and spinning machine therefor

Title (en)

Method for producing a yarn and spinning machine therefor

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Garnes und Spinnmaschine hierfür

Title (fr)

Procédé et machine à filer d'un fil

Publication

EP 0947618 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106355 A

Priority

DE 19815049 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947618A2] The yarn from the drafting and condensing systems is twisted and wound up on a pot spinning arrangement (41) without a balloon. An Independent claim is also included for a spinning machine with a drafting system (1) fitted with a strand condensing arrangement (9) feeding a pot spinning arrangement (41). The machine can also be adapted for core yarn spinning and for pseudo-doubled yarn.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D01H 5/72; D01H 7/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/08 (2006.01); D01H 5/26 (2006.01); D01H 5/72 (2006.01); D01H 5/74 (2006.01); D01H 7/74 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01H 1/08 (2013.01); D01H 5/72 (2013.01); D02G 3/367 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947618 A2 19991006; EP 0947618 A3 20001025; EP 0947618 B1 20030924; DE 19815049 A1 19991014; DE 19815049 B4 20040819; JP H11315424 A 19991116; US 6202398 B1 20010320

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080415

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080319

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080328

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-09-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040625

2003-10-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907075 P 20031030

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SAURER GMBH & CO. KG

2003-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-09-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

2003-08-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: W. SCHLAFHORST AG & CO.

2002-11-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020924

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE IT LI

2001-01-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001117

2000-10-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE IT LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI