Global Patent Index - EP 0947628 A3

EP 0947628 A3 2000-04-19 - Roller

Title (en)

Roller

Title (de)

Walze

Title (fr)

Rouleau

Publication

EP 0947628 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105994 A

Priority

DE 19814597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947628A2] The circuit includes a pumping unit (17) inside the roller (1). PREFERRED FEATURES:- The pumping unit fixed at one end in the roller and rotates with it. The pump surrounds a roller stub shaft, extending to a radial extremity of the circuit. Its drive pinion runs in a fixed ring gear (21,22), turning it as the roller rotates. The heat exchanger (5) secondary side includes axi-parallel tubes inside a chamber, with a supply connection. It has a distribution pipe passing the heat exchange fluid, surrounding a flow path of the outer heat exchange fluid. The distribution tube has openings (16) distributed circumferentially and axially.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02; D21F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/10 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/028 (2013.01); D21F 5/10 (2013.01); D21G 1/0266 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947628 A2 19991006; EP 0947628 A3 20000419; EP 0947628 B1 20020904; DE 19814597 C1 19991014; US 6250376 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2004-04-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040413

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902519 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI