Global Patent Index - EP 0947628 B1

EP 0947628 B1 2002-09-04 - Roller

Title (en)

Roller

Title (de)

Walze

Title (fr)

Rouleau

Publication

EP 0947628 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99105994 A

Priority

DE 19814597 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947628A2] The circuit includes a pumping unit (17) inside the roller (1). PREFERRED FEATURES:- The pumping unit fixed at one end in the roller and rotates with it. The pump surrounds a roller stub shaft, extending to a radial extremity of the circuit. Its drive pinion runs in a fixed ring gear (21,22), turning it as the roller rotates. The heat exchanger (5) secondary side includes axi-parallel tubes inside a chamber, with a supply connection. It has a distribution pipe passing the heat exchange fluid, surrounding a flow path of the outer heat exchange fluid. The distribution tube has openings (16) distributed circumferentially and axially.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21G 1/02; D21F 5/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/02 (2006.01); D21F 5/10 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 5/028 (2013.01); D21F 5/10 (2013.01); D21G 1/0266 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FI FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947628 A2 19991006; EP 0947628 A3 20000419; EP 0947628 B1 20020904; DE 19814597 C1 19991014; US 6250376 B1 20010626

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-03-25 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2005-03-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050325

2004-04-13 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040413

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-24 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-22 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-02-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-04 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021112

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902519 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020201

2000-12-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FI FR GB

2000-12-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH

2000-05-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000321

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FI FR GB

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI