Global Patent Index - EP 0947633 B1

EP 0947633 B1 2000-05-03 - Process and apparatus for stationary dispensing de-icing liquids

Title (en)

Process and apparatus for stationary dispensing de-icing liquids

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur stationären Ausbringung flüssigen Taumittels

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif stationnaire de distribution de solution de sel à dégel

Publication

EP 0947633 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 98105077 A

Priority

EP 98105077 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0962594A2] A number of spray bodies (1) are provided and the ratio of road surface in square meters to the number of spray positions where the spray bodies are located is in the range of 15 to 40. Connected to the pump is a ring conduit (4), from which pierced conduits (5) lead to the thawing agent issue points. In these conduits are valves which when the pump is deactivated at least partly guarantees the filling of the conduits with thawing agent.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E01H 10/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C10M 169/04 (2006.01); C10M 163/00 (2006.01); C10M 167/00 (2006.01); E01H 10/00 (2006.01); C10N 30/06 (2006.01); C10N 40/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E01H 10/005 (2013.01); C10M 2205/00 (2013.01); C10M 2205/024 (2013.01); C10M 2205/026 (2013.01); C10M 2205/028 (2013.01); C10M 2207/287 (2013.01); C10M 2207/288 (2013.01); C10M 2207/289 (2013.01); C10M 2209/084 (2013.01); C10M 2215/04 (2013.01); C10M 2215/06 (2013.01); C10M 2215/064 (2013.01); C10M 2215/065 (2013.01); C10M 2215/066 (2013.01); C10M 2215/067 (2013.01); C10M 2215/068 (2013.01); C10M 2215/08 (2013.01); C10M 2215/082 (2013.01); C10M 2215/086 (2013.01); C10M 2215/12 (2013.01); C10M 2215/122 (2013.01); C10M 2215/26 (2013.01); C10M 2215/28 (2013.01); C10M 2217/046 (2013.01); C10M 2217/06 (2013.01); C10M 2219/046 (2013.01); C10M 2219/066 (2013.01); C10M 2219/068 (2013.01); C10M 2219/085 (2013.01); C10M 2219/10 (2013.01); C10M 2219/102 (2013.01); C10M 2219/104 (2013.01); C10M 2219/106 (2013.01); C10M 2219/108 (2013.01); C10M 2223/045 (2013.01); C10M 2227/00 (2013.01); C10M 2227/06 (2013.01); C10M 2227/061 (2013.01); C10M 2227/062 (2013.01); C10M 2227/063 (2013.01); C10M 2227/065 (2013.01); C10M 2227/066 (2013.01); C10M 2229/02 (2013.01); C10M 2229/04 (2013.01); C10M 2229/041 (2013.01); C10M 2229/042 (2013.01); C10M 2229/043 (2013.01); C10M 2229/044 (2013.01); C10M 2229/045 (2013.01); C10M 2229/046 (2013.01); C10M 2229/047 (2013.01); C10M 2229/048 (2013.01); C10M 2229/05 (2013.01); C10M 2229/051 (2013.01); C10M 2229/052 (2013.01); C10M 2229/053 (2013.01); C10M 2229/054 (2013.01); C10N 2210/06 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C10M 2215/28 + C10M 2215/28
  2. C10M 2219/046 + C10M 2219/046

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0962594 A2 19991208; EP 0962594 A3 19991222; AT 192521 T 20000515; AU 2635399 A 19991018; CA 2324948 A1 19990930; CA 2324948 C 20080212; CA 2558677 A1 19990930; CA 2558677 C 20091020; DE 59800142 D1 20000608; DK 0947633 T3 20000925; EP 0947633 A1 19991006; EP 0947633 B1 20000503; ES 2145635 T3 20000701; GR 3033423 T3 20000929; HU 0101251 A2 20010828; HU 0101251 A3 20010928; HU 224544 B1 20051028; JP 2002507678 A 20020312; JP 2010159626 A 20100722; JP 4522581 B2 20100811; NO 20004608 A 20000915; NO 20004608 D0 20000915; NO 334397 B1 20140224; PL 198125 B1 20080530; PL 342968 A1 20010716; RU 2239019 C2 20041027; SI 947633 T1 20000831; US 6126083 A 20001003; WO 9949142 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-02 [REG GR ML] LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: ML

- Ref Document Number: 20000401113

- Country of Ref Document: GR

- Effective date: 20161006

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-12-30 [REG SI KO00] LAPSE OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: KO00

- Effective date: 20161121

2016-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160321

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 192521

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-10-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160320

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 19

2015-06-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150313

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150319

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150311

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: FRIBAIR S.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: PFA

2005-01-10 [REG SI IF] VALID ON THE PRS DATE

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD4D

2000-09-25 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145635

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000601

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-06-14 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AXX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000225;SI PAYMENT 20000225

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59800142

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-06-08

2000-05-31 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: GERMAN

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: RO PAYMENT 20000225;SI PAYMENT 20000225

2000-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 192521

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-05-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980921

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI