Global Patent Index - EP 0947637 A3

EP 0947637 A3 2000-06-14 - Thermal and/or sound insulating element and treatment process and device, especially coating of insulating materials

Title (en)

Thermal and/or sound insulating element and treatment process and device, especially coating of insulating materials

Title (de)

Dämmstoffelement zu Wärme- und/oder Schalldämmzwecken sowie Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Behandlung, insbesondere Beschichtung von Dämmstoffen

Title (fr)

Elément d'isolation thermique et/ou phonique ainsi que procédé et dispositif de traitement, en particulier de revêtement d'isolants

Publication

EP 0947637 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101171 A

Priority

DE 19815170 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947637A2] The insulating element is used for heat and sound damping purposes. It comprises a heat insulating plate, especially mineral fibers, e.g. glass or rock wool fibers, or polystyrol hard foam, with a surface coating. The plate (1) has a perforated surface at least over the coating area, and has numerous holes open to the coating. The coating (8) has projections which locate into the holes so the hardened coating has a nail type anchoring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04B 1/74

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28B 19/00 (2006.01); E04B 1/76 (2006.01); E04B 1/80 (2006.01); E04B 1/90 (2006.01); E04C 2/288 (2006.01); E04B 1/84 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/762 (2013.01); E04B 1/80 (2013.01); E04B 1/90 (2013.01); E04B 2001/8471 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947637 A2 19991006; EP 0947637 A3 20000614; EP 0947637 B1 20060329; AT 321921 T 20060415; AT 378478 T 20071115; DE 19815170 A1 19991014; DE 19815170 C2 20001116; DE 19815170 C5 20060406; DE 59913269 D1 20060518; DE 59914557 D1 20071227; EP 1564338 A1 20050817; EP 1564338 B1 20071114

INPADOC legal status


2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100122

2010-11-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100803

2009-05-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090115

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090113

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20070102

2006-05-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59913269 P 20060518

2006-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE

2005-09-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: THERMAL AND/OR SOUND INSULATING ELEMENT AND TREATMENT PROCESS, ESPECIALLY COATING OF INSULATING MATERIALS

2003-10-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030819

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEUTSCHE ROCKWOOL MINERALWOLL GMBH & CO. OHG

2001-02-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT DE

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-06-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7E 04B 1/76 A

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI