Global Patent Index - EP 0947641 A3

EP 0947641 A3 2000-02-23 - Apparatus for slidingly positioning building elements

Title (en)

Apparatus for slidingly positioning building elements

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur verschieblichen Anordnung von Bauelementen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour positionner de manière coulissante des éléments de construction

Publication

EP 0947641 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105704 A

Priority

DE 29805713 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947641A2] Each reinforcing component (1), typically an anchor bolt, has a component (2) securing it to a common supporting member (3), in which there are openings allowing limited movement in the member lengthwise direction. The connecting components can be permanently engaged with the member, the length of the openings in the latter being at the most equal to the maximum static movement distance of the reinforcing component. Each connecting component can have two or more distorting lugs, which can be bent from the installation position, in which they are parallel, into the working one in which they extend in opposite directions.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/06; E04B 5/43; E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/0645 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805713 U1 19980820; AT 252671 T 20031115; EP 0947641 A2 19991006; EP 0947641 A3 20000223; EP 0947641 B1 20031022

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-02-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060209

- Year of fee payment: 8

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-10-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040723

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-20 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040320

2003-11-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59907411 P 20031127

2003-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

2000-11-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE LI

2000-10-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000811

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-02-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI