Global patent index - EP 0947642 A3

EP 0947642 A3 2000-01-12 - Method of working connection end of deformed bar for reinforcing concrete, deformed bar worked by the method and structure of connecting deformed bar

Title (en)

Method of working connection end of deformed bar for reinforcing concrete, deformed bar worked by the method and structure of connecting deformed bar

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Anschlussendes an einem verformten Bewehrungsstab für Stahlbeton, verformter Bewehrungsstab nach diesem Verfahren hergestellt und Bauweise zum Anschluss eines verformten Bewehrungsstabes

Title (fr)

Procédé de réalisation d'une extrémité de jonction à une barre déformée pour béton armé, barre déformée réalisée au moyen de ce procédé et structure de jonction pour barre déformée

Publication

EP 0947642 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302528 A

Priority

  • CA 2268878 A
  • KR 19980011278 A
  • TW 88109033 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947642A2] With an object of providing a method of working a connection end portion of deformed bar for reinforcing concrete considerably reducing working expense by enhancing easiness of working by promoting mechanical strength of a connection portion by being able to work the connection portion without destructing a steel skeleton structure of a connection portion between pieces of steel bar, deformed bar worked by the method and a connection structure of deformed bar, the invention provides a method of working a connection end portion of deformed bar for reinforcing concrete featured in comprising a swaging step in which in deformed bar for reinforcing concrete featured in swaging at least a connection end portion at normal temperature and forming a rolled thread portion at an outer peripheral face of the connection end portion of the deformed bar subjected to the swaging step in which at least one connection end portion is swaged at a normal temperature such that a maximum diameter of the connection end portion is equal to or slightly larger than a diameter of a cylindrical body of the deformed bar or slightly smaller than a diameter of the deformed bar depending on a degree of working; and a rolling step of forming a thread portion having a diameter substantially equal to a swaging diameter at an outer peripheral face of the connection end portion of the deformed bar which has been subjected to the swaging step. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 5/16; B21B 1/16; E04C 5/03

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21H 3/02 (2006.01); B21B 1/16 (2006.01); B21J 5/08 (2006.01); B21K 1/56 (2006.01); E04C 5/03 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01); E04C 5/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 5/165 (2013.01); B21B 1/163 (2013.01); E04C 5/03 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947642 A2 19991006; EP 0947642 A3 20000112; EP 0947642 B1 20060531; AU 2257499 A 19991014; CA 2268878 A1 20001013; CA 2268878 C 20030429; CN 1239172 A 19991222; JP H11342448 A 19991214; TW 440482 B 20010616

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160404

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160331

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-31 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-05-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070301

2007-04-13 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: FREI PATENTANWALTSBUERO AG

2007-01-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-07-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69931544

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-07-06

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

2006-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2006-05-31 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-05-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060531

2005-06-22 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD OF WORKING CONNECTION END OF DEFORMED BAR FOR REINFORCING CONCRETE

2003-04-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030306

2000-09-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000626

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR GB IT LI

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHUNG, GYENG OK

2000-08-30 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: YOO, CHUNG KI

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI