Global Patent Index - EP 0947659 A3

EP 0947659 A3 2000-11-02 - Glass fibre reinforced spacer frame for insulating glazing and corner making method for the same

Title (en)

Glass fibre reinforced spacer frame for insulating glazing and corner making method for the same

Title (de)

Abstandhalterrahmen aus glasfaserverstärktem Kunststoff für Isolierglasscheiben und Verfahren zum Bilden von Ecken in einem solchen Abstandhalter

Title (fr)

Cadre intercalaire en matière plastique renforcée par des fibres de verre pour vitrage isolant et méthode pour la production d'angles dans ledit cadre

Publication

EP 0947659 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105901 A

Priority

DE 19814044 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947659A2] A spacing frame for insulating glass panes comprises a hollow profile section made of glass fiber reinforced plastics with corner sections (1-4). Shanks are located between the corners and contain a drying agent (9). The hollow profile has a cut at the corners, and the cuts (21) extend through the inner section to the outer section without penetrating the latter. Angled sections (11-14) reinforce the corners and the drying agent is enclosed in the shanks between stoppers.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663; E06B 3/673

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/663 (2006.01); E06B 3/673 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/67313 (2013.01); E06B 3/66319 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947659 A2 19991006; EP 0947659 A3 20001102; DE 19814044 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2003-07-23 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-07-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020610

2001-09-12 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

2001-07-18 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: CH DE FR LI

2001-06-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010407

2000-11-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-11-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI