Global Patent Index - EP 0947661 B1

EP 0947661 B1 2003-06-04 - One-way locking device for roller shutter

Title (en)

One-way locking device for roller shutter

Title (de)

Einwegarretiereinrichtung für Rolladen

Title (fr)

Dispositif de blocage unidirectionnel pour volet roulant

Publication

EP 0947661 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99440064 A

Priority

FR 9804275 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947661A1] The lock mechanism, fitted between the shutter drive (6) and its shaft (4), consists of a brake (14) with a fixed plate (15) and a spring loaded mobile plate (17), and a dog clutch (29) between the drive and shaft. The moving plate is connected to one half (18) of the dog clutch which is fitted into the end of the shaft; the other half is connected to the drive.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 9/78; E06B 9/68

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/68 (2006.01); E06B 9/78 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 9/78 (2013.01); E06B 9/68 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947661 A1 19991006; EP 0947661 B1 20030604; DE 69908473 D1 20030710; DE 69908473 T2 20040513; ES 2200487 T3 20040301; FR 2777037 A1 19991008; FR 2777037 B1 20000526

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2005-03-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050326

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-16 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040416

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2200487 T3

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69908473 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

2002-04-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020222

2000-06-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BUBENDORFF VOLET ROULANT

2000-03-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000124

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI