Global patent index - EP 0947664 A3

EP 0947664 A3 2000-12-06 - Method for monitoring a telescopic drill string and a protection device for a telescopic drill string

Title (en)

Method for monitoring a telescopic drill string and a protection device for a telescopic drill string

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Überwachen einer teleskopierbaren Bohrstange und Schutzvorrichtung für eine teleskopierbare Bohrstange

Title (fr)

Procédé de controle d'une tige de forage télescopique et dispositif de protection d'une tige de forage télescopique

Publication

EP 0947664 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104296 A

Priority

DE 19813902 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813902C1] The method involves measuring the required holding force for the rotary drive holder (8). This is compared with the theoretical pulling force based on the weight of the tubes (2,6,7). This force starts with the total weight of the tubes and is successively reduced to the weight of at least a further tube in dependence on the stroke distance covered. A signal is generated when the measured holding force falls to a predetermined value below the force corresponding to the respective stroke distance. Independent claims also cover a protective device for a telescopic tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E21B 17/07; E21B 19/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E21B 15/00 (2006.01); E21B 17/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E21B 17/07 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813902 C1 19990617; AT 274634 T 20040915; EP 0947664 A2 19991006; EP 0947664 A3 20001206; EP 0947664 B1 20040825

INPADOC legal status

2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160329

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-11-28 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080303

2007-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070323

- Year of fee payment: 9

2005-08-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050526

2005-06-24 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-09-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910317

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-09-30

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-08-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2004-01-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031118

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BAUER MASCHINEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-22 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE FR IT

2001-01-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001201

2000-12-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-11-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7E 21B 17/07 A, 7E 21B 19/08 B

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI