Global Patent Index - EP 0947672 A3

EP 0947672 A3 2000-08-02 - Variable valve control for an internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Variable valve control for an internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Variable Ventilsteuerung für eine Hubkolben-Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Commande de soupape variable pour un moteur à combustion interne

Publication

EP 0947672 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99104523 A

Priority

DE 19814800 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947672A2] An inlet closed camshaft (3) has an inlet closed cam (5) for controlling the closure function of the inlet valve (7a,7b). An inlet operating lever transmits the positioning movement of the inlet opened cam (4a,4b) and the inlet closed cam (5) to the inlet valve (7a,7b). An outlet operating lever (10) transmits the positioning movement of the outlet cam (6) to the outlet valve (8). A device alters the phase position between the two camshafts (2,3). The distance of the central planes (11,27) of the inlet closed cam and outlet cam is less than the sum of half the outlet cam width and half the inlet closed cam width.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01L 13/00; F01L 1/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01L 13/0047 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947672 A2 19991006; EP 0947672 A3 20000802; DE 19814800 A1 19991014; US 6058896 A 20000509

INPADOC legal status


2002-04-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011002

2001-04-11 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-08-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01L 13/00 A, 7F 01L 1/26 B

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI