Global Patent Index - EP 0947674 A3

EP 0947674 A3 2000-01-12 - Muffler for internal combustion engine

Title (en)

Muffler for internal combustion engine

Title (de)

Schalldämpfer für eine interne Brennkraftmaschine

Title (fr)

Silencieux pour moteur a combustion interne

Publication

EP 0947674 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99105157 A

Priority

IT LC980002 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947674A2] Exhaust muffler for internal combustion engines comprising at least two portions of external shell (1,2) reciprocally joined along perimeter edges (3) and internal separators (4) in one-piece with at least one of the portions of external shell to form chambers (5,6,7) and/or connecting pipes (8,9) fit to allow the passage of the exhaust gases from an entry section, or opening (10), to an exit section, or opening (11), for the exhaust gases. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F01N 7/18; F01N 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/16 (2010.01); F01N 13/18 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 13/1866 (2013.01); F01N 13/16 (2013.01); F01N 13/1888 (2013.01); F01N 2530/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947674 A2 19991006; EP 0947674 A3 20000112; ES 2137913 T1 20000101; IT 1306539 B1 20010611; IT LC980002 A1 19991004; IT LC980002 D0 19980403

INPADOC legal status


2003-11-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030520

2003-02-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030109

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT

2000-09-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000707

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 01N 7/18 A, 7F 01N 7/16 B

2000-01-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2137913 T1

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI