Global patent index - EP 0947698 A3

EP 0947698 A3 2000-04-26 - Safety hose

Title (en)

Safety hose

Title (de)

Sicherheitsschlauch

Title (fr)

Dispositif de sécurité pour tube

Publication

EP 0947698 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 98123994 A

Priority

DE 19814728 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947698A2] The channel (13) is provided with a detector device, preferably a pressure sensor or conductivity sensor, for conveyed material within it. The hose (1) has at least one coupling and the channel in the area of the coupling extends out of the hose. The hose pump has a housing (2,6,7) with a suction connection. The at least one hose, which is connected both to the pressure and suction connections, locates on the inner wall of the housing. The hose pump has at least one squeeze body (3) which is so moved along the hose that the hose is squeezed together by each squeeze body out of the direction of the suction connection into that of the pressure connection. The hose has an inner core (12), a cover (10) and a reinforcement (11) between them.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04B 43/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 5/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/00 (2006.01); F04B 43/12 (2006.01); F16L 11/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04B 43/0072 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947698 A2 19991006; EP 0947698 A3 20000426; AU 1003099 A 19991125; BR 9903178 A 20010313; DE 19814728 A1 19991007; JP H11315971 A 19991116; KR 20000011171 A 20000225; SG 83113 A1 20010918; US 6093002 A 20000725

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020702

2001-01-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

2000-08-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000617

2000-04-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI