Global patent index - EP 0947707 A3

EP 0947707 A3 2001-02-28 - Cooling air withdrawal from the outside of a diffuser of a gas turbine compressor stage

Title (en)

Cooling air withdrawal from the outside of a diffuser of a gas turbine compressor stage

Title (de)

Kühlluftentnahme auf der Gehäuseseite eines Diffusors einer Kompressorstufe von Gasturbinen

Title (fr)

Prélèvement d' air de refroidissement du côté extérieur d' un diffuseur d' un compresseur de turbine à gaz

Publication

EP 0947707 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101372 A

Priority

DE 19814627 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947707A2] The cooling air removal device is so formed that the cooling air is removed on one side through apertures (6) on the housing side (20.1) of the diffuser and is fed through cooling air channels (10) to the parts fed with hot gas including also the outer wall of the cuff tube. The compressed air is conducted through cooling air holes (19) in the diffuser blades (3) to the diffuser exterior (20.2).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02C 7/18 (2006.01); F04D 29/44 (2006.01); F04D 29/54 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/682 (2013.01); F04D 29/444 (2013.01); F05D 2250/52 (2013.01); Y10S 415/914 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947707 A2 19991006; EP 0947707 A3 20010228; EP 0947707 B1 20040908; CA 2265164 A1 19991001; CA 2265164 C 20050906; DE 19814627 A1 19991014; DE 19814627 C2 20010222; JP 4019391 B2 20071212; JP H11343866 A 19991214; US 6155777 A 20001205

INPADOC legal status

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150127

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-09-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150126

2015-09-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140131

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140121

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110131

2011-10-14 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20110930

2011-06-01 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: MAN DIESEL & TURBO SE, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59910423

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110325

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-08-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050609

2005-08-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-11-24 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

2004-11-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: TRGR

2004-10-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59910423

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-10-14

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-09-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2004-09-08 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-07-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-09-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030729

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: DE FR GB IT SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010316

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-28 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MAN TURBOMASCHINEN AG GHH BORSIG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI