Global Patent Index - EP 0947708 A3

EP 0947708 A3 2001-03-07 - A cross-flow fan and an air-conditioner using it

Title (en)

A cross-flow fan and an air-conditioner using it

Title (de)

Querstromlüfter und damit versehene Klimaanlage

Title (fr)

Ventilateur à courant transversal et climatiseur l'utilisant

Publication

EP 0947708 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99106442 A

Priority

JP 8327898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947708A2] A number of vanes 12 are disposed in a peripheral direction of a plurality of supporting disks disposed along a rotary shaft 14 at given intervals. Each vane 12 is disposed at an angular interval as determined by a logistic representation. Thereby the intensity and variations of noise levels at around 8N on the low-frequency side, as well as the noise level caused by rotary first-order sounds, can be reduced. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/66; F04D 29/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/283 (2013.01); F04D 29/666 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5266007 A 19931130 - BUSHNELL PETER R [US], et al
  • [A] EP 0785362 A1 19970723 - MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]
  • [A] DE 4421604 C1 19950413 - SIEMENS AG [DE]
  • [A] US 5681145 A 19971028 - NEELY MICHAEL J [US], et al
  • [A] MELLIN R C ET AL: "CONTROLLING THE TONAL CHARACTERISTICS OF THE AERODYNAMIC NOISE GENERATED BY FAN ROTORS", TRANSACTIONS OF THE AMERICAN SOCIETY OF MECHANICAL ENGINEERS, SERIES D: JOURNAL OF BASIC ENGINEERING,US,ASME. NEW YORK, vol. 92, no. 1, 1 March 1970 (1970-03-01), pages 143 - 154, XP002030072

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947708 A2 19991006; EP 0947708 A3 20010307; EP 0947708 B1 20050202; DE 69923490 D1 20050310; DE 69923490 T2 20060216; KR 100545985 B1 20060125; TW 377393 B 19991221

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090329

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080402

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080407

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080311

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080327

- Year of fee payment: 10

2006-01-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20051103

2005-12-30 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-03-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69923490 P 20050310

2005-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2005-02-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-09-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030731

2001-11-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB IT

2001-06-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010419

2001-03-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-03-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI