Global Patent Index - EP 0947763 A3

EP 0947763 A3 2001-04-04 - Reflector substrate for illumination device and reflector for illumination device

Title (en)

Reflector substrate for illumination device and reflector for illumination device

Title (de)

Reflektor-Substrat für Beleuchtungsvorrichtung und Reflektor für Beleuchtungsvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Substrat de réflecteur pour dispositif d' éclairage et réflecteur pour dispositif d'éclairage

Publication

EP 0947763 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99302275 A

Priority

JP 9676598 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947763A2] A reflector substrate 1 for an illumination device comprises an aromatic polyimide film or aromatic polyamide film molded article. In addition, a reflector 8 for an illumination device is comprised of a reflecting layer 10 generated by vapor depositing a reflecting material on a reflector substrate comprising an aromatic polyimide film or an aromatic polyamide film molded article. The reflector substrate of the invention is light in weight and excellent in surface smoothness, safety, moldability, heat resistance, and handling characteristics. The reflector substrate requires no pre-treatment when the reflector layer is generated and it is suitable for mass production. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F21V 7/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F21V 7/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F21S 48/1394 (2013.01); F21V 7/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947763 A2 19991006; EP 0947763 A3 20010404; CN 1230695 A 19991006; JP H11273431 A 19991008

INPADOC legal status


2002-07-31 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20011005

2002-02-28 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2002-01-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

2001-04-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-04-04 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI