Global patent index - EP 0947769 A3

EP 0947769 A3 2000-01-26 - Blue flame burner

Title (en)

Blue flame burner

Title (de)

Blaubrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à flamme bleue

Publication

EP 0947769 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106458 A

Priority

DE 19814768 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947769A2] The combustion air feed (1) has a deflector (5) on it end with air-passages (2) and adjacent next to a flame tube (7) open on the combustion chamber side. The flame tube has an exhaust gas return opening (6) on a level with the fuel nozzle (3) of a nozzle connection (4). The flame tube acts as a premixing and precondensing tube over most of its length. Flame stabilizers (8) are positioned at the end of the flame tube and consist of a narrowing of the cross-section of the combustion chamber side end of the flame tube.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 11/40; F23C 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/00 (2006.01); F23D 11/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 9/006 (2013.01); F23D 11/406 (2013.01); F23D 2209/20 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11402 (2013.01); F23D 2900/11403 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947769 A2 19991006; EP 0947769 A3 20000126; DE 19814768 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status

2001-05-30 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20000727

2000-11-09 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2000-10-04 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-26 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI