Global Patent Index - EP 0947771 A3

EP 0947771 A3 2000-01-19 - Gas burner

Title (en)

Gas burner

Title (de)

Gasbrenner

Title (fr)

Brûleur à gaz

Publication

EP 0947771 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106084 A

Priority

DE 19813898 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947771A2] The first part combustion zone (A) is screened against the ambient heat by insulation (16), which at least partly surrounds the burner body (15). The insulation is arranged between the heat exchanger (17) and the burner body. In the exhaust gas side area and in the flow direction of the combustion gas-air mixture behind the burner body, an exhaust gas heat exchanger (18) is arranged.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/16; F23C 11/00; F24H 1/43; F24H 1/44

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23C 99/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23C 99/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813898 A1 19990930; DE 19813898 B4 20080529; EP 0947771 A2 19991006; EP 0947771 A3 20000119

INPADOC legal status


2004-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040116

2003-01-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021213

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7F 23D 14/16 A, 7F 23C 11/00 B, 7F 24H 1/43 B, 7F 24H 1/44 B

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI