Global patent index - EP 0947772 A3

EP 0947772 A3 2000-01-19 - Segmented insulation for burners with porous body

Title (en)

Segmented insulation for burners with porous body

Title (de)

Segmentierte Isolierungen für Brenner mit porösen Medien

Title (fr)

Revêtement isolant segmenté pour brûleurs avec corps poreux

Publication

EP 0947772 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106000 A

Priority

DE 19813897 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947772A2] The insulation comprises an insulating body (10), comprising several segment bodies (10.1) connected to one another forming dividing positions (11a). The dividing positions run in the direction of the inflowing combustion medium and/or adopt a ring-shaped path crossways to the inflowing combustion medium. The dividing positions between the segment bodies have an overlapping area (16.2) at which extensions (16.4) cover over the segment bodies. The segment bodies are shell-shaped, forming a curvature radius, and can be assembled to form a ring-shaped insulating body (10). The segment bodies of the insulating bodies are made of ceramic, ceramic fiber, metal foam, ceramic foam and or fire concrete.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23D 14/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23D 14/46 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813897 A1 19990930; EP 0947772 A2 19991006; EP 0947772 A3 20000119

INPADOC legal status

2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030603

2000-09-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free Format Text: DE ES FR GB IT NL

2000-09-13 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000719

2000-01-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-19 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI