Global Patent Index - EP 0947775 A3

EP 0947775 A3 2000-01-12 - Two-parts holder for stone slabs

Title (en)

Two-parts holder for stone slabs

Title (de)

Zweiteiliger Halter für Steinplatten

Title (fr)

Support en deux parties pour dalles en pierre

Publication

EP 0947775 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106400 A

Priority

DE 19814723 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947775A2] The incinerator stone slab holder has a bolt (20) with a welded foot (22) on one end. The opposite end has a hook (30) for engaging behind a suspended flange. The flange has two skirt sections (37,39) extending downwardly from the suspended flange.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23M 5/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/04 (2006.01); F23M 5/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23M 5/08 (2013.01); F23M 5/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947775 A2 19991006; EP 0947775 A3 20000112; DE 19814723 C1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2002-09-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020319

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011123

2000-09-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR LI NL

2000-03-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000128

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-01-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR LI NL

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI