Global Patent Index - EP 0947776 A3

EP 0947776 A3 2001-02-07 - Oven with cooling system

Title (en)

Oven with cooling system

Title (de)

Garofen mit Kühleinrichtung

Title (fr)

Four à dispositif de refroidissement

Publication

EP 0947776 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106660 A

Priority

DE 19814526 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947776A2] The front side faces away from the oven muffle, the back side faces the muffle, and there is a top side. Preferably the top part of the front side has a door handle (5). An air duct part has at least one air inlet on the back and or top side, and opens into an outer compartment on the front side, preferably in the top part in at least one air-outlet. The air flowing in through the air inlet is conducted beneath and past the door handle into an outer chamber.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F24C 15/00; F24C 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/00 (2006.01); F24C 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24C 15/024 (2013.01); F24C 15/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947776 A2 19991006; EP 0947776 A3 20010207; EP 0947776 B1 20040623

INPADOC legal status


2015-02-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140430

2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141101

2015-01-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141231

2015-01-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909779

- Effective date: 20141101

2014-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59909779

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130515

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-06-15 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-02-25 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040922

2004-07-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59909779 P 20040729

2004-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-06-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030509

2001-10-24 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB

2001-08-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010612

2001-02-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI