Global Patent Index - EP 0947785 A4

EP 0947785 A4 2000-06-07 - COLD-ACCUMULATING MATERIAL AND COLD-ACCUMULATING REFRIGERATOR

Title (en)

COLD-ACCUMULATING MATERIAL AND COLD-ACCUMULATING REFRIGERATOR

Title (de)

KÄLTESPEICHERNDES MATERIAL UND KÄLTESPEICHERNDER KÜHLSCHRANK

Title (fr)

MATERIAU ACCUMULATEUR DE FROID ET REFRIGERATEUR A ACCUMULATION DE FROID

Publication

EP 0947785 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 98947963 A

Priority

  • JP 9804749 W
  • JP 28720097 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947785A1] A cold accumulating material comprising magnetic substance expressed by the general formula: RCu1-xM1+x wherein R denotes at least one of rare earth element selected from the group consisting of Y, La, Ce, Pr, Nd, Pm, Sm, Eu, Gd, Tb, Dy, Er, Ho, Tm and Yb, M denotes at least one element selected from the group consisting of Ag, Au, Al, Ga, In, Ge, Sn, Sb, Si, Bi, Ni, Pd, Pt, Zn, Co, Rh, Ir, Mn, Fe, Ru, Cr, Mo, W, V, Nb, Ta, Ti, Zr and Hf, and wherein Ni and Ge are not simultaneously selected, and x in atomic ratio satisfies a relation: -0.95 </= x </= 0.90. According to the above structure, there can be provided a cold accumulating material and a refrigerator using the cold accumulating material capable of exhibiting a remarkable and stable refrigerating performance at an extremely low temperature for a long time. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F25B 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 9/14 (2006.01); H01F 1/01 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 1/015 (2013.01); F25B 9/14 (2013.01); H01F 1/0009 (2013.01); F25B 2309/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947785 A1 19991006; EP 0947785 A4 20000607; EP 0947785 B1 20030423; CN 1174200 C 20041103; CN 1248319 A 20000322; DE 69813767 D1 20030528; DE 69813767 T2 20040212; WO 9920956 A1 19990429

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060503

2004-10-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041014

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-04-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040126

2003-05-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69813767 P 20030528

2003-04-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE

2000-06-07 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000426

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): DE

1999-10-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19990616

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE