Global patent index - EP 0947793 A3

EP 0947793 A3 2000-08-09 - Finned-tube heat exchanger

Title (en)

Finned-tube heat exchanger

Title (de)

Rippenrohr-Wärmetauscher

Title (fr)

Echangeur de chaleur à tubes ailettes

Publication

EP 0947793 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200971 A

Priority

  • IT MI980690 A
  • IT MI980689 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947793A2] A finned-tube heat exchanger, particularly for combined-cycle systems and the like, which comprises a plurality of finned tubes (1) arranged in rows with fins (2) which comprise two parts, respectively a proximal part (3), which is solid and fixed to the surface of the tubes (1), and a segmented distal one (4); the particularity of the exchanger is that if p is the distance between two solid proximal parts (3) of two adjacent fins (2), the distal parts (4) of some fins (2) are bent away from the median plane of the fins (2) themselves, so that the distance between the distal part (4) of the bent fins (2) and the distal part (4) of a consecutive fin (2) is between 0.3 and 1.7 p. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28F 1/36 (2006.01); F28F 13/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 13/185 (2013.01); F28F 1/36 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947793 A2 19991006; EP 0947793 A3 20000809

INPADOC legal status

2003-01-02 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18W

- Date of withdrawal: 20021105

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020620

2001-04-25 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2001-03-21 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010122

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-08-09 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI