Global Patent Index - EP 0947797 A3

EP 0947797 A3 2001-02-21 - Method for combat training in armoured vehicles

Title (en)

Method for combat training in armoured vehicles

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Gefechtsausbildung in gepanzerten Landfahrzeugen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour l'entraînement au combat dans des véhicules blindés

Publication

EP 0947797 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99106737 A

Priority

DE 19814998 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947797A2] The battle simulation method uses the armored vehicle itself as the simulation space. A battle simulation processor (14) is coupled to the onboard central processing system (1), for providing a simulated battle scene on the viewing monitors (3-5). The simulation processor provides simulated function data, corresponding to the operation of the vehicle controls, with all real functions of the vehicle, e.g. the engine, the steering and the weapon systems being blocked. An Independent claim for a battle simulation device is also included.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F41A 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F41A 33/00 (2006.01); F41G 3/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F41A 33/00 (2013.01); F41G 3/2694 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947797 A2 19991006; EP 0947797 A3 20010221; EP 0947797 B1 20030326; CA 2266915 A1 19991003; DE 19814998 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170614

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-19 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2004-03-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031230

2004-01-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-10-15 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: DIEHL STIFTUNG & CO. KG

2003-07-08 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2003-07-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-04-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904684 P 20030430

2003-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

2003-03-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-02-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020103

2001-11-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR GB SE

2001-04-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010208

2001-02-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-02-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMIDT, DIRK, DR.

1999-11-17 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUGHES, CHRISTOPHER P.

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI