Global Patent Index - EP 0947969 A3

EP 0947969 A3 2000-09-06 - Device for detection of vehicles, particularly to count the number of vehicles

Title (en)

Device for detection of vehicles, particularly to count the number of vehicles

Title (de)

Einrichtung zur Fahrzeugerfassung, insbesondere Fahrzeugzählung

Title (fr)

Dispositif de détection de véhicules, en particulier le comptage de véhicules

Publication

EP 0947969 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105487 A

Priority

DE 19814183 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947969A2] The device registers and counts the vehicles (F1,F2) travelling along 2 adjacent traffic lanes (A,B), using a number of successive ultrasonic sensors (A1,A2 ; B1,B2) spaced along each lane. The sensors are coupled to respective evaluation devices (AE,BE) for each traffic lane, with virtual sensor signals (SA1',SA2',...SB1',SB2'..) transmitted between the evaluation devices which are linked via at least one sensor synchronisation line (L7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G08G 1/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G08G 1/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947969 A2 19991006; EP 0947969 A3 20000906; EP 0947969 B1 20040204; AT 259090 T 20040215

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2006-05-22 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060522

- Year of fee payment: 8

2005-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051130

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-17 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-03-17 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050317

2005-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041105

2004-10-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-07 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040607

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-23 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908441 P 20040311

2004-03-04 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040304

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-27 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SIEMENS SCHWEIZ AG

2004-02-25 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040204

2004-02-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-02-11 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040211

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

2004-02-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-05-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT CH DE FR GB LI

2000-11-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2000-09-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7G 08G 1/04 A, 7G 08G 1/065 B

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB LI

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI