Global Patent Index - EP 0947972 A3

EP 0947972 A3 2000-04-12 - Display panel for changeable informations

Title (en)

Display panel for changeable informations

Title (de)

Anzeigetafel zur Wiedergabe veränderlicher Informationen

Title (fr)

Panneaux d'affichage pour informations variables

Publication

EP 0947972 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99250104 A

Priority

DE 19816345 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0947972A2] The display panel has the displayed information represented by a number of image points provided by different color particles (2), with image particles for the different colors held in respective supply containers (1) and transported to the image plane for assembly of the color image representing the information via a feed device. The color particles are fed back to the individual supply containers via a color-selective sorting device (7).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 9/37

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/37 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 9/377 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0947972 A2 19991006; EP 0947972 A3 20000412; DE 19816345 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-01 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20001019

2004-08-04 [32PN] PUBLIC NOTIFICATION UNDER RULE 80 EPC

- Ref Legal Event Code: 32PN

- Free Format Text: EINSCHREIBEN (FORM 2901) MIT DER AUFFORDERUNG FAELLIGE GEBUEHREN (PRUEFUNGS- UND BENENNUNGSGEBUEHREN) INNERHALB EINER FRIST ZU ENTRICHTEN, ADRESSI

2001-11-14 [D17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED (DELETED)

- Ref Legal Event Code: D17P

2000-12-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-12-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001011

2000-04-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-04-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI