Global Patent Index - EP 0948010 A3

EP 0948010 A3 2000-07-12 - Electrical push switch

Title (en)

Electrical push switch

Title (de)

Elektrischer Tastschalter

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électrique à touche

Publication

EP 0948010 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99101255 A

Priority

DE 29805719 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948010A2] The switch (1) has at least one pivoted operating wiper (8) acting on at least one switch contact element (10) via a switch arm (14) which can be mounted in 2 alternate positions. The switch arm has 2 alternate bearing planes (16,17) for cooperation with the switch contact element dependent on the orientation of the switch arm and 2 corresponding coupling planes (18,19) for cooperation with the operating wiper.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 23/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/00 (2006.01); H01H 23/14 (2006.01); H01H 23/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 11/0006 (2013.01); H01H 23/14 (2013.01); H01H 23/006 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805719 U1 19980528; EP 0948010 A2 19991006; EP 0948010 A3 20000712

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030910

2003-06-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GIRA GIERSIEPEN GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020426

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE DE NL

2000-08-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000621

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2000-04-03 [TCNL] NL: TRANSLATION OF PATENT CLAIMS FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: TCNL

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE NL

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI