Global patent index - EP 0948011 A3

EP 0948011 A3 2000-05-03 - Switch assembly for high-voltage electric power lines

Title (en)

Switch assembly for high-voltage electric power lines

Title (de)

Schalter für Hochspannungsnetzleitung

Title (fr)

Interrupteur pour lignes de puissance électriques à haute tension

Publication

EP 0948011 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99200972 A

Priority

IT MI980672 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948011A2] A switch assembly for high-voltage electric power lines, comprising a supporting base, which is supported by one or more supporting posts, and operating means for actuating a line disconnection maneuver. The switch assembly also comprising on the supporting base and arranged in two lateral rows and a central row: six insulating supporting columns, equally divided along the two lateral rows; three circuit breakers with a column insulator, mutually aligned along the central row on a substantially vertical plane which is perpendicular to the supporting base, a two-blade disconnector being associated with each one of the circuit breakers, a first one of the blades having an end which is connected to the moving contact of the circuit breaker and a second one of the blades having an end which is connected to the fixed contacts of the circuit breaker, the circuit breaker and the two blades associated therewith being rotatable together about the vertical axis of the circuit breaker, for a possible line disconnection actuated by the actuation means; and instrument transformers. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/12; H01H 33/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/02 (2006.01); H01H 33/12 (2006.01); H01H 31/00 (2006.01); H01H 33/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/125 (2013.01); H01H 33/027 (2013.01); H01H 31/003 (2013.01); H01H 33/008 (2013.01); H01H 33/022 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948011 A2 19991006; EP 0948011 A3 20000503; IT 1298973 B1 20000207; IT MI980672 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2009-02-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20080829

2008-05-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20071009

2002-07-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TRASMISSIONE & DISTRIBUZIONE SPA

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT DE ES FR IT NL SE

2000-12-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-05-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR IT NL SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI