Global Patent Index - EP 0948012 A3

EP 0948012 A3 2000-07-05 - Switch with electromagnetic driving mechanism

Title (en)

Switch with electromagnetic driving mechanism

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Schaltgerät mit Magnetantrieb

Title (fr)

Interrupteur à commande électromagnétique

Publication

EP 0948012 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105933 A

Priority

DE 19814414 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948012A2] The electromagnetic switch has a magnetic drive with a stationary magnetic core and a movable magnetic armature (3), supported in an armature seating (30), the armature movement controlling a switch wiper. The armature seating has a longitudinal bore (301) on the opposite side to the armature, parallel to the armature axis, receiving a bolt (4) with screw fixings at either end for securing the armature seating to the switch wiper, fitted with adjustment plates (5) for the armature stroke.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 3/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2013.01); H01H 3/28 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948012 A2 19991006; EP 0948012 A3 20000705; EP 0948012 B1 20040303; DE 19814414 A1 19991007; DE 19814414 C2 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160223

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140324

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140325

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130308

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120323

- Year of fee payment: 14

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MOELLER GMBH

- Free text: MOELLER GMBH#HEIN-MOELLER-STRASSE 7-11#53115 BONN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOELLER GMBH#HEIN-MOELLER-STRASSE 7-11#53115 BONN (DE)

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI SE

2003-12-11 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LANKUTTIS, KLAUS

2003-11-05 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BINKA, KONRAD

2001-03-14 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR IT LI SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI