Global Patent Index - EP 0948013 A3

EP 0948013 A3 2000-07-12 - Electromagnetic switch with rocker

Title (en)

Electromagnetic switch with rocker

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Schaltgerät mit Schaltwippe

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électromagnétique avec bascule

Publication

EP 0948013 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105934 A

Priority

DE 19814433 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948013A2] The electromagnetic switch has a multi-part housing enclosing movable switch contacts and a magnetic drive with a movable magnetic armature (2) coupled to a switch wiper (5), for operation of the switch contacts. The switch wiper seating is provided by two abutting housing parts (10,20), with a U-shaped cross-section for insertion of the wiper perpendicular to the load direction of the loading force on the wiper upon opening and closure of the switch contacts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 33/66; H01H 3/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2006.01); H01H 3/28 (2006.01); H01H 33/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 33/666 (2013.01); H01H 3/28 (2013.01); H01H 33/022 (2013.01); H01H 2033/6665 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948013 A2 19991006; EP 0948013 A3 20000712; EP 0948013 B1 20040303; DE 19814433 C1 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170307

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-01-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-01-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-10-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2013-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20130129

- Year of fee payment: 15

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: MOELLER GMBH

- Free text: MOELLER GMBH#HEIN-MOELLER-STRASSE 7-11#53115 BONN (DE) -TRANSFER TO- MOELLER GMBH#HEIN-MOELLER-STRASSE 7-11#53115 BONN (DE)

2005-02-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041206

2004-12-03 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-06-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2004-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-03-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI SE

2004-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040303

2001-03-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR IT LI SE

2001-02-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001222

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-07-12 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI