Global Patent Index - EP 0948015 A3

EP 0948015 A3 2000-09-20 - Electrical domestic machine, in particular continuous-flow heater

Title (en)

Electrical domestic machine, in particular continuous-flow heater

Title (de)

Elektro-Hausgerät, insbesondere elektrischer Durchlauferhitzer

Title (fr)

Machine électro-domestique, en particulier chauffe-liquide instantané

Publication

EP 0948015 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105888 A

Priority

DE 19814302 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948015A2] The through-flow water heater (DE) has a safety cut-out switch (SS) for separating it from the electrical voltage supply (SV), with cyclic testing of the safety switch function without operation of the safety switch, e.g. via a microprocessor control (C).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 47/00; F24H 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/20 (2006.01); H01H 47/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 9/2028 (2013.01); H01H 47/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948015 A2 19991006; EP 0948015 A3 20000920; DE 19814302 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2002-03-06 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010321

2001-06-06 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-09-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HEMMERICH, KARL-HEINZ

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: LORENZ, THOMAS

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHNEIDER-HOHENDORF, PAUL

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WENZEL, WERNER

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ZILL, JOERG

1999-11-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: DINKEL, EUGEN

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI