Global Patent Index - EP 0948016 A3

EP 0948016 A3 2000-10-11 - Multi-part electromagnetic switch housing

Title (en)

Multi-part electromagnetic switch housing

Title (de)

Elektromagnetisches Schaltgerät mit einem mehrteiligen Gehäuse

Title (fr)

Interrupteur électromagnétique avec un boîtier constitué de plusieurs pièces

Publication

EP 0948016 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99105335 A

Priority

DE 19814432 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0948016A2] The electromagnetic switch has a contact space receiving the stationary and movable contacts and a drive space receiving a magnetic drive with a magnetic core, an electromagnetic coil and a movable magnetic armature, for operation of the movable contacts, defined by a multi-part switch housing. The drive space housing (100) has a magnetic core housing frame (10) and a magnetic armature housing frame (20) fitted together, with a base plate (30) secured to the open underside of the magnetic core housing frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 50/04; H01H 50/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/04 (2006.01); H01H 50/02 (2006.01); H01H 50/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 50/045 (2013.01); H01H 50/042 (2013.01); H01H 50/021 (2013.01); H01H 50/305 (2013.01); H01H 2300/042 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0948016 A2 19991006; EP 0948016 A3 20001011; EP 0948016 B1 20050831; CN 1124630 C 20031015; CN 1230759 A 19991006; DE 19814432 C1 19991223; HK 1022209 A1 20040702

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170309

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170307

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170124

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170222

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-02-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-02-29 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: DTS ZUERICH;RESIRAIN 1;8125 ZOLLIKERBERG (CH)

2007-05-15 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Representative's name: DTS ZUERICH; CH

2006-08-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20060601

2006-06-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2005-12-13 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2005-11-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: DTS ZUERICH SCHWEIZER- UND EUROPAEISCHE PATENTANWA

2005-08-31 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI SE

2005-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2005-06-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: ELECTROMAGNETIC SWITCHING DEVICE HAVING A MULTI-PART HOUSING

2001-08-02 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2001-06-27 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH FR IT LI SE

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010321

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-10-11 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH FR IT LI SE

1999-10-06 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI