Global patent index - EP 0948027 A3

EP 0948027 A3 2000-12-20 - Image forming apparatus using an electron-beam generating device

Title (en)

Image forming apparatus using an electron-beam generating device

Title (de)

Bilderzeugungsgerät mittels einem Elektronenstrahlerzeugungsgerät

Title (fr)

Dispositif de formation d'image utilisant un dispositif générateur de faisceau d'électrons

Publication

EP 0948027 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 99201433 A

Priority

  • EP 96300688 A
  • JP 1678095 A
  • JP 5413395 A
  • JP 955596 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0725420A2] An image forming apparatus using an electron source which has matrix-wired electron-emitting devices connected with wiring electrodes of conductive material, and a fluorescent member as an image forming member with an accelerating electrode on its inner surface side, opposite to the electron-emitting devices. The wiring electrodes includes a wiring electrode where a semiconductive support member (spacer) is provided via a conductive connection member and a wiring electrode where the semiconductive support member is not provided. The height of the upper surface of the conductive connection member on which the semiconductive support member is provided and that of the upper surface of the wiring electrode where the semiconductive support member is not provided are the same, to prevent shift of electron-beam trajectories around the semiconductive support member, due to disturbance of electric-field distribution. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01J 31/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 1/304 (2006.01); H01J 1/316 (2006.01); H01J 5/03 (2006.01); H01J 29/02 (2006.01); H01J 29/04 (2006.01); H01J 29/86 (2006.01); H01J 29/87 (2006.01); H01J 31/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 29/028 (2013.01); H01J 29/864 (2013.01); H01J 31/127 (2013.01); H01J 2201/025 (2013.01); H01J 2201/3165 (2013.01); H01J 2329/864 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8645 (2013.01); H01J 2329/8655 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0725420 A2 19960807; EP 0725420 A3 19961204; EP 0725420 B1 19991215; CN 1072838 C 20011010; CN 1136174 A 19961120; DE 69605580 D1 20000120; DE 69605580 T2 20000511; DE 69638149 D1 20100422; EP 0948027 A2 19991006; EP 0948027 A3 20001220; EP 0948027 B1 20100310; JP 3320294 B2 20020903; JP H08315723 A 19961129

INPADOC legal status

2014-11-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-11-06 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69638149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140801

2014-10-31 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20140930

2014-09-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20140131

2014-08-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 69638149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130131

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130123

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20130214

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100310

2011-02-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20101213

2010-10-29 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-06-30 [REG NL VDEP] INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: VDEP

- Effective date: 20100310

2010-05-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: FUSHIMI, MASAHIRO

2010-05-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: MITSUTAKE, HIDEAKI

2010-05-12 [RIN2] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN2

- Inventor name: SANOU, YOSHIHISA

2010-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69638149

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2010-04-22

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-03-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 0725420

- Country of Ref Document: EP

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2010-03-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2010-03-10 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-01-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031212

2001-07-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010503

2000-12-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

2000-12-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7H 01J 31/12 A

1999-10-06 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 725420

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1999-10-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL